TN HB1560 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department of transportation to authorize the state treasurer to establish a program for the sale of nonrefundable gift vouchers, gift cards, rebates, incentives, debit cards or any other form of electronic payments for special license plate fees. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the department of transportation to authorize the state treasurer to establish a program for the sale of nonrefundable gift vouchers, gift cards, rebates, incentives, debit cards or any other form of electronic payments for special license plate fees. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869 |
2014-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-11 | House | Reset on Regular cal. for 4/14/14 |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1718 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 869