TN HB1557 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes state senate districts. - Amends TCA Section 3-1-102.
Title
As enacted, establishes state senate districts. - Amends TCA Section 3-1-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-10 - House - STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-10 - House - STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514 | |
2012-01-13 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-01-12 | Held on desk. | |
2012-01-10 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1/12/2012 | |
2012-01-10 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-01-04 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 1/10/2012 | |
2012-01-04 | Rec. for pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-12-28 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 1/4/2012 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1514 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-14 - Pub. Ch. 514