TN HB1550 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, extends the deadline by which a tourism construction project must be initiated, from December 31, 2023, to December 31, 2024, as a condition to receiving funding for such project from the proceeds of the Madison County and City of Jackson hotel-motel tax. - Amends Chapter 324 of the Private Acts of 1980; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 324 of the Private Acts of 1980; as amended by Chapter 34 of the Private Acts of 1985; Chapter 65 of the Private Acts of 2005 and Chapter 54 of the Private Acts of 2020; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the hotel-motel tax for Madison County and the City of Jackson.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Pr. Ch. 14 | |
2023-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 9, PNV 4 |
2023-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1542 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14