TN HB1545 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 744
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 744
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases penalty for TennCare fraud from Class E felony to Class D felony; creates specific fines for first and subsequent convictions for TennCare fraud. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 26.
Title
As enacted, increases penalty for TennCare fraud from Class E felony to Class D felony; creates specific fines for first and subsequent convictions for TennCare fraud. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 26.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 744 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2548 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 744