TN HB1545 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 524
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 524
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that buildings used as residences by farmers and farm workers are “incidental to the agricultural enterprise”. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that buildings used as residences by farmers and farm workers are “incidental to the agricultural enterprise”. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 524 |
2014-02-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/5/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1706 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-24 - Pub. Ch. 524