TN HB1544 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the index of appropriations from state tax revenues for 2022-2023 fiscal year to exceed the index of estimated growth in the state's economy by $2,536,600,000 or 11.45 percent. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 52.
Title
AN ACT pursuant to Article II, Section 24, of the Tennessee Constitution providing for the dollar amount and rate by which the growth of appropriations from state tax revenues will exceed the estimated growth in the state's economy and to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 52.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2023 | |
2023-05-17 | Pub. Ch. 419 | |
2023-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1534 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 419