TN HB1540 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and wine on Sundays during certain hours; prohibits sales on Easter, Christmas, and Thanksgiving; revises other provisions relating to alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and wine on Sundays during certain hours; prohibits sales on Easter, Christmas, and Thanksgiving; revises other provisions relating to alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 11 BY WIRGAU PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 42 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY DANIEL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY DANIEL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 9 BY SEXTON J. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 10 BY SEXTON J. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO DEFER (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Pub. Ch. 783
2018-04-23 Effective date(s) 04/20/2018; 01/01/2019
2018-04-20 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-17HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-16SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-11HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-11SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 17, Nays 11, PNV 3
2018-04-11SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0799)
2018-04-11SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1028)
2018-04-11SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 55, Nays 35, PNV 4
2018-04-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 12 - HA1150)
2018-04-09HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 11 - HA1149)
2018-04-09HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA1126)
2018-04-09HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA1127)
2018-04-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0802)
2018-04-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0801)
2018-04-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0800)
2018-04-09HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 10 - HA1148)
2018-04-09HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 9 - HA1147)
2018-04-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 8 - HA1145)
2018-04-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 7 - HA1144)
2018-04-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA1008)
2018-04-05HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018
2018-04-05HouseReset on cal. for 4/9/2018
2018-03-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-27HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 2/27/2018
2018-02-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-01-29HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-19HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-10HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2518 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 783

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1540&ga=110
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB1540.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/110/pub/pc0783.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0800.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0802.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1008.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1126.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1127.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1144.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1145.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1147.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1148.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1149.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1150.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/HB1540.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM1952.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2209.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2651.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2726.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1540&ga=110

Bill Comments

feedback