TN SB2518 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and wine on Sundays during certain hours; prohibits sales on Easter, Christmas, and Thanksgiving; revises other provisions relating to alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and wine on Sundays during certain hours; prohibits sales on Easter, Christmas, and Thanksgiving; revises other provisions relating to alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 783 | |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1540 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 783