TN HB1533 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee High Growth Sustainable Jobs Act." - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee High Growth Sustainable Jobs Act." - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 66 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2011-04-20 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1177 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1533&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1533.pdf |