TN HB1530 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires health plans and pharmacy benefits managers to provide to enrollees upon request certain information about covered drugs and benefits under the enrolleeās health plan. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 56, relative to healthcare costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1249 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee