TN HB1530 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows Type D school buses to remain in service for 15 years, with the commissioner of education able to grant a waiver for an additional five years on a year-to-year basis upon inspection. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21.
Title
As introduced, allows Type D school buses to remain in service for 15 years, with the commissioner of education able to grant a waiver for an additional five years on a year-to-year basis upon inspection. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to last calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/11/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1945 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-28 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1530&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1530.pdf |