TN HB1523 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires residents of a correctional institution, who cannot by law register in the county as voters, to be included in consideration of representation at their recorded home of residence prior to incarceration, or their new address if there is a change of home residence while incarcerated, for calculations of allocations for census-based federal and state aid. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5 and Title 41, relative to apportionment of inmates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-23 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 1/23/2024 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1138 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-19 - Sponsor(s) Added.