TN SB1138 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires residents of a correctional institution, who cannot by law register in the county as voters, to be included in consideration of representation at their recorded home of residence prior to incarceration, or their new address if there is a change of home residence while incarcerated, for calculations of allocations for census-based federal and state aid. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5 and Title 41, relative to apportionment of inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-19SenateRe-refer to S. Cal Comm
2023-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2023
2023-04-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-12SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2023
2023-04-12SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0338)
2023-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2023
2023-03-28SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-03-07SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2023
2023-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2023
2023-02-28SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/7/2023
2023-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1523 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback