TN HB1523 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 878
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 878
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons, and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons, and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 878 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0903) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1020) |
2016-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1473 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 878