TN HB1521 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer to undergo annual de-escalation training and an annual mental health evaluation in order to be certified by the peace officer standards and training commission; requires each law enforcement agency to adopt a policy limiting the circumstances under which a law enforcement officer may initiate pursuit of a suspect or person of interest using a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 38.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to law enforcement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-12HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2024-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/12/2024
2024-01-23HouseDef. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Public Service Subcommittee
2024-01-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 1/23/2024
2023-03-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2024
2023-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1481 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback