TN SB1481 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer to undergo annual de-escalation training and an annual mental health evaluation in order to be certified by the peace officer standards and training commission; requires each law enforcement agency to adopt a policy limiting the circumstances under which a law enforcement officer may initiate pursuit of a suspect or person of interest using a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1521 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee