TN HB1511 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1077
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, redesignates, from nonmoving to moving, traffic violations for transmitting or reading written messages on hand-held devices while driving; requires that first offenders for transmitting or reading written messages on hand-held devices while driving attend and complete a driver education course. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, redesignates, from nonmoving to moving, traffic violations for transmitting or reading written messages on hand-held devices while driving; requires that first offenders for transmitting or reading written messages on hand-held devices while driving attend and complete a driver education course. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 52 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1077
2016-05-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-05-20 Signed by Governor.
2016-05-09HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-04-20HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA2 Ayes 73, Nays 14 PNV 0 HB1511
2016-04-20HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/20/2016
2016-04-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 20, Nays 11, PNV 2
2016-04-19SenateSenate Amendment #3 withdrawn.
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-14SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
2016-04-13SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2016
2016-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016
2016-04-11SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2016
2016-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016
2016-04-07SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2016
2016-04-07SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0915)
2016-04-07SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0734)
2016-04-07SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2016-03-30SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2016-03-29HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2016-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-28HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 52, Nays 36, PNV 2
2016-03-28HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0945)
2016-03-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2016
2016-03-23HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
2016-03-22HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/22/2016
2016-03-16HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2016-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
2016-01-19HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2016-01-14HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2016-01-13HouseIntro., P1C.
2016-01-12HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1589 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1077

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback