TN HB1509 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 739
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 739
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that clerks of general sessions and circuit courts are required to notify the TBI of final disposition of criminal proceedings as soon as practicable but no later than 30 days after final disposition of the proceedings. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401; Section 8-4-115; Title 16; Title 18 and Section 39-17-1316.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that clerks of general sessions and circuit courts are required to notify the TBI of final disposition of criminal proceedings as soon as practicable but no later than 30 days after final disposition of the proceedings. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401; Section 8-4-115; Title 16; Title 18 and Section 39-17-1316.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 739 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2016 | |
2016-04-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0644) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0595) |
2016-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1774 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 739