TN HB1503 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes from January 31 to January 15 the deadline for the commissioner to submit the annual report on implementation of a secure web portal for the submittal of online permit applications under the Water Quality Control Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68 and Title 69.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 68 and Title 69, relative to the department of environment and conservation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1214 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback