TN HB1501 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pr. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, redesignates the title of "county executive" to "county mayor." - Amends Chapter 137 of the Private Acts of 2004.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subject to local approval, redesignates the title of "county executive" to "county mayor." - Amends Chapter 137 of the Private Acts of 2004.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24 Pr. Ch. 1
2019-04-18 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-05HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-03-28SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-26HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-25HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-04HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-02-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-25HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1510 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 1

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback