TN SB1510 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, redesignates the title of "county executive" to "county mayor." - Amends Chapter 137 of the Private Acts of 2004.
Title
Subject to local approval, redesignates the title of "county executive" to "county mayor." - Amends Chapter 137 of the Private Acts of 2004.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 1 | |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1501 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Pr. Ch. 1