TN HB1497 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the process for certification as an outdoor fireworks display operator, proximate pyrotechnic display operator, or flame effect display operator. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 104.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 104, relative to display operators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 435 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0263 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021, 07/01/2021