TN HB1497 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends employment protections for members of the army and air national guard, state guard, and civil air patrol of any other state to members who are called to active duty in Tennessee or any other state. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 33; Title 50 and Title 58, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, extends employment protections for members of the army and air national guard, state guard, and civil air patrol of any other state to members who are called to active duty in Tennessee or any other state. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 33; Title 50 and Title 58, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1444 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-02 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee