TN HB1492 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, generally requires by January 1, 2024, each law enforcement agency to develop and enforce a policy that prohibits an officer from using a drone or other substantially similar device as a weapon under any circumstances while in the exercise of the officer's official duties; requires a law enforcement agency to permit an officer qualified to operate a drone to utilize a drone or a substantially similar device for the purpose of remotely detonating a bomb or similar incendiary or explosive device. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 3 and Chapter 462 of the Private Acts of 2021.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 3 and Chapter 462 of the Private Acts of 2021, relative to drones.
Sponsors
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 326 | |
2023-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0351) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2023-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0096) |
2023-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-15 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1019 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326