TN HB1483 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the legislative librarian to list of persons to whom the comptroller must provide the annual report on state lending programs and state credit support programs. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 45.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9 and Title 45, relative to finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0155 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee