TN HB1477 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2017-2018 school year, each LEA to offer students in each of its high schools the opportunity to take at least six early postsecondary credit courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2017-2018 school year, each LEA to offer students in each of its high schools the opportunity to take at least six early postsecondary credit courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0599) |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1653 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee