TN HB1476 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the use of student performance and student growth data from TCAP tests in identifying priority schools and assigning schools to the achievement school district. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school performance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1501 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee