TN HB1472 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the annual report district attorneys general submit regarding administrative subpoenas of internet service accounts must be submitted to the criminal justice committee instead of the judiciary committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 19; Title 20; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 19; Title 20; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the administration of justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/1/2022 |
2021-04-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1537 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee