TN HB1455 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes a reference to a repealed section that required the division of health related boards to provide to the board of pharmacy the names of all nurse practitioners and physician assistants who are authorized to write and sign prescriptions or issue legend drugs in Tennessee and the names of their supervising physicians. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to nurses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | Ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0196 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee