TN HB1453 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires coverage under the Volunteer Rx discount program for smoking cessation products beginning October 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 57 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, Chapter 57 and Title 71, relative to discount programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0575 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee