TN HB1448 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 517
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 517
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, rewrites provisions governing selection and retention of judges; replaces judicial selection commission with judicial nominating commission. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 16 and Title 17.
Title
As enacted, rewrites provisions governing selection and retention of judges; replaces judicial selection commission with judicial nominating commission. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 16 and Title 17.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 517 | |
2009-05-28 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-21 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/28/09 | |
2009-05-21 | Reset on regular cal. for 5/28/09 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/21/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-03-17 | Sponsor change. | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1573 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 517
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1448&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1448.pdf |