TN HB1437 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allocates certain revenue from state and local sales taxes to pay for capital projects and debt service associated with a sports facility of a major league professional football franchise. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to sports facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 401
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-11 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-03HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-04-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0403)
2021-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-28SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-27HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-27HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 10, PNV 4
2021-04-27HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0405)
2021-04-26HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced behind the budget
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Sports Facilities Calendar
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-22HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseRef. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-25HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1543 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 401

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback