TN SB1543 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allocates certain revenue from state and local sales taxes to pay for capital projects and debt service associated with a sports facility of a major league professional football franchise. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to sports facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 401
2021-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2021
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-23SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-02-23SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1437 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 401

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback