TN HB1418 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases library tax to be charged on actions of all county courts. - Amends Chapter 275 of the Private Acts of 1970; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, increases library tax to be charged on actions of all county courts. - Amends Chapter 275 of the Private Acts of 1970; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 32 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-19 | House | Held on desk. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 2018 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1446 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pr. Ch. 32