TN HB1416 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes persons housed in emergency management agency camps or shelters to possess personal items and portable electronic devices, including mobile telephones and laptop computers. - Amends TCA Title 58.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes persons housed in emergency management agency camps or shelters to possess personal items and portable electronic devices, including mobile telephones and laptop computers. - Amends TCA Title 58.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0327)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0244)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1219 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback