TN HB1405 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions concerning local air pollution control regulations. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 201.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions concerning local air pollution control regulations. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 201.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284
2017-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-17HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-04-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-04HouseAction def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 4/11/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2017-03-23HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1371 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 284

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback