TN HB1379 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds LEAs to the provisions whereby a county, municipality, utility district, or other local governmental entity having centralized purchasing authority with a full-time purchasing agent is authorized, by resolution or ordinance of its governing body, to increase the threshold over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids or proposals are required to an amount not to exceed $25,000 for nonemergency, nonproprietary purchases. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-1212 and Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, adds LEAs to the provisions whereby a county, municipality, utility district, or other local governmental entity having centralized purchasing authority with a full-time purchasing agent is authorized, by resolution or ordinance of its governing body, to increase the threshold over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids or proposals are required to an amount not to exceed $25,000 for nonemergency, nonproprietary purchases. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-1212 and Title 49, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415 | |
2017-05-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0897 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 415