TN HB1379 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, removes requirement that persons be issued wheel tax decals for display on license plates as evidence of having paid the wheel tax. - Amends Chapter 258 of the Private Acts of 1963; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, removes requirement that persons be issued wheel tax decals for display on license plates as evidence of having paid the wheel tax. - Amends Chapter 258 of the Private Acts of 1963; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Pr. Ch. 2 | |
2015-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-23 | House | Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1410 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 2