TN HB1369 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Natural Marriage Defense Act," which states the policy of Tennessee to defend natural marriage between one man and one woman regardless of any court decision to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Natural Marriage Defense Act," which states the policy of Tennessee to defend natural marriage between one man and one woman regardless of any court decision to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1282 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee