TN HB1354 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-14)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the Tennessee higher education commission to include data from the Tennessee Promise scholarship program report created in collaboration with the Tennessee student assistance corporation in the annual Tennessee postsecondary education fact book. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the Tennessee higher education commission to include data from the Tennessee Promise scholarship program report created in collaboration with the Tennessee student assistance corporation in the annual Tennessee postsecondary education fact book. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0381)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0365)
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1175 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback