TN HB1351 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an action brought against a county for any wrong, injury, loss, damage or expense resulting from any act or failure to act on the part of any deputy appointed by the sheriff to be filed within one year after the cause of action accrued; clarifies that failure of the county to respond in 60 days is not a default but rather the county is deemed to have denied the material, well pleaded factual allegations of the complaint. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 8 and Title 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 8 and Title 29, relative to liability for certain acts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451 | |
2023-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-22 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0491 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023