TN HB1351 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes an intercollegiate athlete at a four-year public or private institution of higher education located in this state, other than an institution of higher education governed by the board of regents of the state university and community college system, to earn compensation for the use of the athlete's name, image, or likeness under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 400
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
2021-05-11 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-03HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3, PNV 1
2021-04-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0245)
2021-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-27SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-26HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-26HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 6
2021-04-26HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0278)
2021-04-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021
2021-04-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1000 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 400

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback