TN SB1000 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes an intercollegiate athlete at a four-year public or private institution of higher education located in this state, other than an institution of higher education governed by the board of regents of the state university and community college system, to earn compensation for the use of the athlete's name, image, or likeness under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 400
2021-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/21/2021
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-19SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/20/21
2021-04-19SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2021-04-19SenateRecalled from Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1351 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 400

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback