TN HB1350 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Failed in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Failed in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates term of office for county administrator of elections to coincide with the term of the county election commission; allows county election commission to consider political party affiliation when appointing an administrator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 12.
Title
As introduced, creates term of office for county administrator of elections to coincide with the term of the county election commission; allows county election commission to consider political party affiliation when appointing an administrator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Local Government Committee (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Failed in Local Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0779 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-23 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.