TN HB1332 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 314
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 314
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises law regarding custody of abused children.
Title
As enacted, revises law regarding custody of abused children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CHILDREN AND FAMILY AFFAIRS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) C&FA SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Children and Family Affairs Com (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CHILDREN AND FAMILY AFFAIRS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) C&FA SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Children and Family Affairs Com (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 314 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/27/11 | |
2011-05-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-18 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-17 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-16 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-16 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-05-04 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-02 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-02 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0218) | |
2011-05-02 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0361) | |
2011-04-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/2/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal C&FA Subcommittee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in s/c C&FA Subcommittee to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal C&FA Subcommittee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&FA | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1150 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 314