TN HB1331 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 60 days to 30 days, the time within which a police officer must return a pay supplement from the time of revocation of a certification due to supplying or acquiescing in false information being supplied to the Tennessee peace officer standards and training commission regarding the officer's eligibility for the certification. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 29 and Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 29 and Title 38, relative to law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0887 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee