TN HB1331 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to notify all members of the general assembly when making a recommendation for outsourcing of a state agency program to the governor and finance, ways and means committees. - Amends TCA Title 9.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to notify all members of the general assembly when making a recommendation for outsourcing of a state agency program to the governor and finance, ways and means committees. - Amends TCA Title 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1327 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.