TN HB1331 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 368
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 368
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands, subject to certain restrictions, the private universities or colleges that are permitted to have police forces. - Amends TCA Section 49-7-118.
Title
As enacted, expands, subject to certain restrictions, the private universities or colleges that are permitted to have police forces. - Amends TCA Section 49-7-118.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 368 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 25, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-04-03 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-04-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 7 |
2013-04-01 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0252) |
2013-04-01 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0175) |
2013-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-25 | House | Reset on Reg cal. for 4/1/13 |
2013-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1382 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 368