TN HB1331 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the TBI to conduct any investigation into the department of children's services that is currently conducted by such department and requires TBI to maintain confidentiality of the department's records. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 37.
Title
As introduced, requires the TBI to conduct any investigation into the department of children's services that is currently conducted by such department and requires TBI to maintain confidentiality of the department's records. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 37.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) C&FA SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Children and Family Affairs Com (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal C&FA Subcommittee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in s/c C&FA Subcommittee to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal C&FA Subcommittee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&FA | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.