TN HB1295 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the requirement that a retailer reimburse a customer for mailing costs incurred in returning clothing for removal of an anti-theft security tag to make it applicable if the customer resides more than a 30-minute, instead of a 15-minute, commute from the retailer. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
As introduced, revises the requirement that a retailer reimburse a customer for mailing costs incurred in returning clothing for removal of an anti-theft security tag to make it applicable if the customer resides more than a 30-minute, instead of a 15-minute, commute from the retailer. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1086 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1295&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1295.pdf |